Accounts and annual returns RELATE ALDERSHOT, FARNBOROUGH AND FLEET MARRIAGE GUIDANCE COUNCIL

Charity Number: 247124
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 13 August 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 06 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 11 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 13 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 20 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 04 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 December 2008 On Time