Accounts and annual returns T W HUGHES MEMORIAL CHURCH HALL

Charity number: 247248
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 22 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 24 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 13 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required