Accounts and annual returns THE BRADFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity Number: 247858
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 24 November 2015 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 20 April 2014 26 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 April 2014 26 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 20 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 20 May 2013 On Time