Accounts and annual returns THE GIFT OF JOHN CORNELIUS PARK

Charity number: 248015
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 December 2008 334 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 December 2008 699 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 May 2006 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted