EAST DEREHAM RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity Number: 248127
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Charity is "to relieve, in cases of need, the sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped, or infirm residents in the Ecclesiastical Parish of East Dereham (and Toftwood), by providing, or paying for items, services, or facilities, to alleviate their suffering, or assist in their recovery, in cases where assistance is not readily available from other sources".

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £305
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EAST DEREHAM AID IN SICKNESS CHARITY (Previous name)
  • EAST DEREHAM MATERNITY AID CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keith Simmons Chair 13 March 2019
EAST DEREHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
AARON WILLIAMSON'S APPRENTICING FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
GOOCH'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Rev PAUL CUBITT Trustee 01 September 2020
EAST DEREHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
GOOCH'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
AARON WILLIAMSON'S APPRENTICING FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
ANDREW NELSON CROSS Trustee 13 March 2019
AARON WILLIAMSON'S APPRENTICING FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Philip Morton Trustee 06 December 2017
GOOCH'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
EAST DEREHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
AARON WILLIAMSON'S APPRENTICING FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Harry Clarke Trustee 22 July 2015
GOOCH'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
EAST DEREHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
AARON WILLIAMSON'S APPRENTICING FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
JOSEPHINE ELIZABETH MATTHEWS Trustee
EAST DEREHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
GOOCH'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
AARON WILLIAMSON'S APPRENTICING FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
ANN PATRICIA JOHNSTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £289 £292 £293 £299 £305
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Breton Close
Dereham
NR19 1JH
Phone:
0781 067 2784
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available