Accounts and annual returns THE DAVIDSON CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 248587
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 06 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 05 August 2009 186 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 23 October 2008 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 04 August 2009 551 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required