Accounts and annual returns LITTLE PORTLAND STREET CHAPEL FUND

Charity number: 248666
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2006 20 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 31 October 2006 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 25 October 2005 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required