Financial history PORTSWOOD CHURCH

Charity Number: 248769
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £217.45k £175.64k £220.73k £219.52k £188.87k
Total expenditure £254.25k £239.19k £223.47k £227.20k £270.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A