Accounts and annual returns R M DOUGLAS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 248775
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 02 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 02 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 02 February 2016 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2014 27 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 27 October 2014 On Time