Financial history MAYOR'S CHARITY FUND

Charity Number: 249521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.57k £2.24k £728 £2.11k £5.22k
Total expenditure £12.00k £7.20k £0 £600 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A