Trustees ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 250610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graeme Brown Chair 23 October 2013
None on record
James Rivett Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Ian Vizor Mr Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
MR Geoff Woodward Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
Roy Wilcox Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
Richard Robins Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
Bernard Ponting Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
Richard Barnes Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Albert Parker Trustee 23 October 2013
None on record
David Ashford Trustee 23 October 2013
None on record
Julian Ponting Trustee 17 August 2011
None on record
Michael Westmacott Trustee
None on record
Terry Soule Trustee
None on record