Trustees THE CONGREGATION OF THE DOMINICAN SISTERS OF MALTA
Charity number: 250683

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER MARY ANNE CARDONA | Chair | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SISTER THERESA SCIORTINO | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIA DOLORES SCHEMBRI | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARIA DOLORES GAUCI | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARY ATTARD | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SISTER FILOMENIA GRIMA | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.