Financial history WILFRED HARRIS YOUNGMAN FOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 251011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.30k £21.97k £12.05k £9.38k £12.81k
Total expenditure £5.51k £7.00k £8.44k £9.50k £10.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.71k £2.67k N/A N/A