Accounts and annual returns EUGENE HALLIDAY INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF HIEROLOGICAL VALUES

Charity number: 251136
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 13 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 07 February 2015 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2013 31 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 31 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2012 31 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 31 January 2013 On Time