Accounts and annual returns ROMAN CATHOLIC MISSION

Charity number: 251280
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 11 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 10 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 21 April 2006 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required