Accounts and annual returns SOUTHERN ORCHESTRAL CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity Number: 251475
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2012 11 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 11 October 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2011 13 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 13 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2010 22 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2010 22 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2009 03 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2009 03 September 2009 On Time