Accounts and annual returns BEVERLEY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 251720
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 25 August 2010 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 14 March 2009 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required