Financial history MINSTERLEY SHOW SOCIETY

Charity Number: 251907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/09/2020 20/09/2021 20/09/2022 20/09/2023 20/09/2024
Total gross income £10.80k £74.38k £94.60k £114.19k £103.86k
Total expenditure £16.95k £69.62k £86.52k £90.98k £91.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A