Financial history CONGREGATION OF ADEN JEWS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 252022
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £202.27k £229.96k £180.79k £259.69k £224.37k
Total expenditure £182.82k £139.33k £100.86k £179.96k £217.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A