Governing document THE JOHN AND RHYS THOMAS JAMES FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1966 AS VARIED BY DEEDS OF 8 FEBRUARY 1967 AND 4 MARCH 1967 AND AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 14 MARCH 1975. AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 16TH NOV. 1979
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE OR ENCOURAGE RELIGION IN WALES. (B) TO SUPPORT PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE HOLDING OF EISTEDDFODAU IN WALES. (C) TO SUPPORT PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE WELSH LEAGUE OF YOUTH. (D) TO PAY TO THE NATIONAL EISTEDDFODAU OF WALES DURING THE PERIOD OF 12 MONTHS FROM THE 29 SEPTEMBER 1966 THE SUM OF $1,000. (E) TO GIVE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY PERSON WHO IS A PRACTISING MEMBER OF VARIOUS RELIGIOUS DENOMINATIONS SPECIFIED PROVIDED THAT SUCH PERSON IS SUFFERING FROM EXCESS POVERTY OR HARDSHIP SUCH ASSISSTANCE TO BE OF SHORT DURATION ONLY AND NOT FOR MORE THAN A PERIOD OF 5 YEARS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 5 OF TRUST DEED. THE NATIONAL EISTODDFODAU OF WALES IS REGISTERED UNDER REFERENCE 219171 THE WELSH LEAGUE OF YOUTH IS REGISTERED WITH D.E.S.
Area of benefit
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.