Trustees WHITNASH ALLOTMENTS CHARITY FOR THE LABOURING POOR
Charity number: 252397

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK HYNES | Chair | 30 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Karen Colls Mrs | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gurhak Singh Rai | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaswinder Singh Dosanjh | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Townsend | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Mason | Trustee | 11 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mason | Trustee | 01 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
JENNY MASON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.