Accounts and annual returns ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E OLDHAM AND DISTRICT PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity Number: 252456
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | 14 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | 27 April 2017 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window