Accounts and annual returns WAR MEMORIAL

Charity number: 252809
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 February 2017 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required