Accounts and annual returns ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E NORTHUMBERLAND AND N E DURHAM PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 253132
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 12 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 20 May 2014 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required