Accounts and annual returns FOREST OF MENDIP LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 253272
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2004 25 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2004 Not Required