Financial history SHEPTON MALLET AMENITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 253698
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £8 £8 £10 £0 £7
Total expenditure £13 £13 £13 £15 £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A