Financial history WILLIAM EDWIN VICKERS MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 254525
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £3 £3 £3 £0 £100
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A