Governing document THE INSTITUTE OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANAGEMENT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 4/9/1918 AS AMENDED BY VARIOUS SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS TO 21/9/1967 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7/9/1976, 17/7/1975, 28/9/1977, 24/9/1991, 31/1/2003, 30/1/2004, 11/2/2005, 31/8/2007 AND 12/9/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SCIENCE OF OFFICE MANAGEMENT IN ALL ITS BRANCHES, AND LIKEWISE TO ENCOURAGE THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF IMPROVED METHODS OF ORGANISATION IN OFFICES. TO COLLECT, COLLATE AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION, IDEAS AND STATISTICS BEARING ON OFFICE MANAGEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.