Financial history ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (WAVERLEY TRUST)

Charity number: 255234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.51k £8.48k £9.68k £10.34k £10.49k
Total expenditure £0 £11.28k £11.50k £11.90k £13.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A