Financial history THE WHYTELEAFE TRUST

Charity Number: 255414
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014
Total gross income £3.20k £2.88k £2.87k £2.74k £2.59k
Total expenditure £3.22k £3.33k £2.92k £2.59k £2.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A