Accounts and annual returns THE FORDINGBRIDGE NURSING AIDS TRUST

Charity Number: 255893
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 08 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 13 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 14 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 17 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required