Accounts and annual returns PARISH CLERK'S LAND

Charity number: 256083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 December 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required