Financial history THE CULLIN TRUST

Charity number: 256427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.95k £1.54k £1.78k £2.19k £1.99k
Total expenditure £1.72k £1.39k £1.94k £2.05k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A