Accounts and annual returns THE CONTACT GROUP TRUST

Charity Number: 256563
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 20 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 20 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 25 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 21 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 14 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 14 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 February 2006 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 17 February 2006 17 days late