Accounts and annual returns THE HOLY SPIRIT ASSOCIATION FOR THE UNIFICATION OF WORLD CHRISTIANITY

Charity number: 256598
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 10 March 2009 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 25 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 09 November 2005 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required