Charity overview SEDDING'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 310546-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 15 DECEMBER 1885 AND 4 OCTOBER 1910 AND TRUSTEES RESOLUTION OF 22ND JULY 2002
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE PARISH BY MEANS OF PRIZES OR REWARDS AND PAYMENTS FOR CONTINUANCE AT SCHOOL PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
STOKE POGES
Registration history
- 26 October 1962: Standard registration
- 10 February 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.