Trustees THE TEDDINGTON THEATRE CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 257265

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Halsey | Chair | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Alice Mary Taylor | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mital Vinodrai Dwarkadas | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Marcus | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Wesley Henderson Roe | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Clare | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Auty | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Frederick Cole | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.