Financial history PEACOCK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 257655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £586.84k £416.83k £490.11k £857.36k £936.66k
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.43m £1.41m £1.28m £1.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £586.84k N/A N/A £857.36k £936.66k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.39m N/A N/A £1.25m £1.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.43k N/A N/A £23.86k £22.70k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £4.31k £5.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.39m N/A N/A £1.25m £1.41m
Expenditure - Investment management £21.43k N/A N/A £23.86k £22.70k
Expenditure - Other £15.76k N/A N/A £0 £0