Accounts and annual returns CHESTER GATEWAY THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 257701
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 February 2006 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 14 February 2006 14 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 05 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 05 January 2005 On Time