Accounts and annual returns TRUST PROPERTY OF THE SECOND CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST MANCHESTER

Charity number: 257808
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 23 November 2015 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required