Governing document PETERBOROUGH DIOCESAN GUILD OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS
Charity number: 258271

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13/05/1972 AND AMENDED 11/06/1977, 10/06/1989, 8/06/1991 AND 13/06/1992
Charitable objects
TO BE OF SERVICE OF THE CHURCH IN THE DIOCESE OF PETERBOROUGH BY: (A) RINGING FOR DIVINE SERVICE. (B) RECRUITING AND TRAINING RINGERS. (C) ENCOURAGING THE ART OF CHANGE RINGING. (D) HELPING RINGERS TO IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF RINGING. (E) CARE AND RESTORATION OF BELLS AND THEIR FITTINGS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DIOCESE OF PETERBORUGH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.