Governing document DARTFORD, GRAVESHAM & SWANLEY MIND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH JUNE 1967, AS AMENDED 5TH MAY 1975, 15TH MAY 1985 AND 26TH JULY 2001 ALSO SEE SCHEME 11TH FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDERS OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
DARTFORD AND GRAVESHAM HEALTH DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.