Governing document THE YORK HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE
Charity number: 258700
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 1969 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1973, 9 APRIL 1975 19 MAY 1976, 11 MAY 1977, 24 MARCH 1981 AND 21 JUNE 1982 AND 10 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND / OR OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN YORK AND NORTH YORKSHIRE, BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR YORK HOSPITALS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
YORK AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.