Accounts and annual returns THE DAVID STERN TRUST

Charity number: 259239
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required