Accounts and annual returns FLEET AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 259428
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2006 05 June 2007 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 05 June 2007 97 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 27 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 27 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 06 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 06 December 2004 On Time