Accounts and annual returns THE NORTH WEST LONDON SEMINARY

Charity number: 259673
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 March 2025 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 March 2025 636 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 March 2025 1001 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1407 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1407 days