Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL FEDERATION OF SOLO CLUBS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 260245
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 10 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 07 January 2015 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required