Accounts and annual returns SENIOR REPRESENTATIVES WELFARE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 260647
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 08 November 2006 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 06 November 2006 99 days late
Annual return 30 September 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 06 November 2006 464 days late