Accounts and annual returns FRANCISCAN INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTRE

Charity number: 260851
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2017 10 July 2018 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 10 July 2018 71 days late
Annual return 30 June 2016 23 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2015 11 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 11 February 2016 On Time