Accounts and annual returns LUDWIG AND HERMINE ROSENTHAL MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 260858
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2004 27 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2004 Not Required